Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1967 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021