Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1987 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021