Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1987 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1987
1+By: Vasut, Geren, Swanson (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 1987
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
3+ May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 24, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to eligibility requirements to hold a political party
612 office.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 161.005, Election Code, is amended by
915 amending Subsections (a) and (c) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
1016 read as follows:
1117 (a) To be eligible to be a candidate for or to serve as an
1218 officer [a county or precinct chair] of a political party, a person
1319 must:
1420 (1) [be a qualified voter of the county; and
1521 [(2)] except as provided by Subsection (c), not be a
1622 candidate for nomination or election to, or be the holder of, an
1723 elective office of the federal, state, or county government; and
1824 (2) if the office is a county or precinct chair of a
1925 political party, be a qualified voter of the county.
2026 (a-1) For purposes of this section, the following are
21- officers of a political party:
22- (1) a precinct chair;
23- (2) a county chair; and
24- (3) a member, a chair, or a vice chair of a state
25- executive committee of a political party.
27+ officers of a political party: precinct chair, county chair, and a
28+ member, vice chair, and chair of a state executive committee of a
29+ political party.
2630 (c) A candidate for nomination or election to, or the holder
2731 of, an elective office of the federal, state, or county government
2832 is eligible to serve as an officer [a county or precinct chair] of a
2933 political party to which Chapter 181 applies.
30- SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
31- ______________________________ ______________________________
32- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
33- I certify that H.B. No. 1987 was passed by the House on May
34- 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 103, Nays 42, 1 present, not
35- voting; that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No.
36- 1987 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 99, Nays 18, 13
37- present, not voting; and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 119
38- authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 1987 on May 31, 2021, by
39- the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
40- ______________________________
41- Chief Clerk of the House
42- I certify that H.B. No. 1987 was passed by the Senate, with
43- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
44- 0; and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 119 authorizing certain
45- corrections in H.B. No. 1987 on May 31, 2021, by the following vote:
46- Yeas 31, Nays 0.
47- ______________________________
48- Secretary of the Senate
49- APPROVED: __________________
50- Date
51- __________________
52- Governor
34+ SECTION 2. This Act applies only to a candidate for
35+ nomination or election to an office the term of which begins on or
36+ after the effective date of this Act.
37+ SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
38+ * * * * *