Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1991 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/22/2021

                            87R1537 JG-F
 By: Thierry H.B. No. 1991


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the maternal mental health peer support pilot program
 for perinatal mood and anxiety disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter G to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER G. MATERNAL MENTAL HEALTH PEER SUPPORT PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 32.201.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Peer support service" means a service provided by
 a peer support specialist to a person with a mental illness or
 substance use condition in accordance with commission rules
 regarding peer specialists.
 (2)  "Perinatal mood and anxiety disorder" includes any
 of the following psychiatric illnesses, as defined by the American
 Psychiatric Association in the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of
 Mental Disorders (DSM), that occur during pregnancy or within 12
 months postpartum:
 (A)  bipolar disorder, including hypomanic,
 manic, depressive, and mixed types;
 (B)  major depressive disorder, including
 single-episode and recurrent types;
 (C)  generalized anxiety disorder;
 (D)  obsessive-compulsive disorder;
 (E)  paranoid or other psychotic disorder; and
 (F)  post-traumatic stress disorder.
 (3)  "Pilot program" means the maternal mental health
 peer support pilot program established under this subchapter.
 Sec. 32.202.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The
 commission shall establish and operate the maternal mental health
 peer support pilot program to reduce the risk and manage the effects
 of perinatal mood and anxiety disorders in women through the
 delivery of peer support services at federally qualified health
 centers located in the geographic areas in which the pilot program
 operates.
 (b)  The commission shall establish the pilot program in five
 counties in this state that:
 (1)  either:
 (A)  are within an area designated as a mental
 health professional shortage area; or
 (B)  have high rates of maternal mortality and
 morbidity as determined by the commission in consultation with the
 Texas Maternal Mortality and Morbidity Review Committee; and
 (2)  include at least one rural county and one county
 with a population of at least 500,000.
 Sec. 32.203.  OPERATION OF PILOT PROGRAM. (a) In
 establishing the pilot program, the commission shall:
 (1)  develop a strategy for federally qualified health
 centers participating in the pilot program and persons responsible
 for training to collaborate on the training, certification, and
 guidance of peer support specialists in accordance with existing
 state procedures and programs;
 (2)  seek comments regarding best practices for the
 design and implementation of the pilot program from relevant
 interested persons, including federally qualified health centers,
 mental health care providers, local mental health authorities,
 certified peer support specialists and affiliated organizations,
 women's health care providers, and individuals who have personal
 experience with perinatal mood and anxiety disorders;
 (3)  develop specialized training to:
 (A)  identify and treat symptoms of perinatal mood
 and anxiety disorders; and
 (B)  provide peer support services to pregnant
 women and new mothers;
 (4)  develop a strategy for federally qualified health
 centers and peer support specialists participating in the pilot
 program to provide peer support services through any form of
 telephonic communication;
 (5)  develop in collaboration with the federally
 qualified health centers participating in the pilot program a
 strategy to integrate the delivery of peer support services with
 the health care services provided by the centers to women during
 pregnancy and within one year of giving birth;
 (6)  create for the federally qualified health centers
 participating in the pilot program a protocol for referring to peer
 support services women who are diagnosed as having or identified as
 being at risk of developing a perinatal mood and anxiety disorder;
 (7)  ensure the services provided by peer support
 specialists under the pilot program are within the scope of a duty
 of care prescribed by commission rule for peer support specialists
 who provide similar services; and
 (8)  develop a method for collecting data, including by
 consulting with the Texas Maternal Mortality and Morbidity Review
 Committee and other relevant entities regarding the data, on:
 (A)  maternal health and mental health outcomes;
 and
 (B)  substance use by women receiving peer support
 services through the pilot program.
 (b)  A peer support specialist who provides peer support
 services through the pilot program at a federally qualified health
 center shall:
 (1)  provide peer support services to women who:
 (A)  based on the results of a postpartum
 depression screening or other screening tool, are diagnosed as
 having or identified as being at risk of developing a perinatal mood
 and anxiety disorder; and
 (B)  are interested in receiving peer support
 services; and
 (2)  through the use of the specialist's personal
 experience with perinatal mood and anxiety disorders:
 (A)  provide guidance to the women;
 (B)  if necessary, advocate for the women to
 receive mental health care services or other specialized health
 care services; and
 (C)  provide the women with information on mental
 health care resources as necessary.
 Sec. 32.204.  FUNDING. In addition to money appropriated by
 the legislature, the commission may accept gifts, grants, and
 donations from any source for establishing the pilot program and
 compensating peer support specialists under the pilot program.
 Sec. 32.205.  REPORT. Not later than January 1, 2023, the
 commission shall prepare and submit to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, and legislature a written report that:
 (1)  evaluates the success of the pilot program in
 reducing perinatal mood and anxiety disorders and substance use in
 women who received peer support services under the pilot program;
 and
 (2)  recommends whether the pilot program should be
 continued, expanded, or terminated.
 Sec. 32.206.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires September
 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 31, 2021, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall adopt rules as necessary to establish the maternal mental
 health peer support pilot program as required by Subchapter G,
 Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than June 30, 2022, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall establish the maternal mental health peer
 support pilot program as required by Subchapter G, Chapter 32,
 Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.