Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1993 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021