Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Record vote RV#652
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Amended 2-Middleton
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Amended 1-Huberty and C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Record vote RV#640
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amended 11-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 10-T. King
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 9-Beckley
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Record vote RV#639
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amended 7-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amended 6-Morales Shaw
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Record vote RV#638
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amended 4-Reynolds
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amended 3-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amended 2-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amended 1-Huberty and Martinez Fischer
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Postponed 5/3/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Postponed 4/28/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|