House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Filed |