Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2025 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2021

                    H.B. No. 2025


 AN ACT
 relating to certain statutes and governmental actions that relate
 to the federal census.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2058.001(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  A governmental entity shall recognize and act on a
 published report or count relating to a federal decennial census
 and released by the director of the Bureau of the Census of the
 United States Department of Commerce on the later of:
 (1)  [on] September 1 of the year after the calendar
 year during which the census was taken [if the report or count is
 published on or before that date]; or
 (2)  [on] the first day of the first calendar month
 occurring after the 150th day after the date of the [its]
 publication of the report or count [if the report or count is
 published after September 1 of the year after the calendar year
 during which the census was taken].
 SECTION 2.  Section 2058.002, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (c)  Nothing in this chapter prohibits the legislature from
 acting on published reports and counts described by Section
 2058.001(b) and relating to the 2020 federal decennial census,
 regardless of the date the reports or counts are published.
 (d)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commissioners court
 of a county may act on published reports or counts described by
 Section 2058.001(b) and relating to the 2020 federal decennial
 census, and any information provided by the state relating to
 redistricting based on those reports or counts, in carrying out the
 commissioners court's duties under Chapter 42, Election Code, with
 respect to establishing or changing election precincts, regardless
 of the date the reports or counts are published or the information
 is provided or any required period for those duties as provided by
 law.
 (e)  This subsection and Subsections (c) and (d) expire
 September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 2058, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 2058.0021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2058.0021.  APPLICABILITY OF 2010 FEDERAL CENSUS;
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) Except as expressly provided by other law
 and notwithstanding the definition of "population" in Sections
 311.005 and 312.011, a statute that applies to a political
 subdivision having a certain population according to the most
 recent federal census:
 (1)  continues to apply to the same political
 subdivisions to which the statute applied under the 2010 federal
 census, regardless of whether the political subdivisions continue
 to have the population prescribed by the statute according to the
 2020 federal census; and
 (2)  does not apply to a political subdivision to which
 the statute did not apply under the 2010 federal census, regardless
 of whether the political subdivision has the population prescribed
 by the statute according to the 2020 federal census.
 (b)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2025 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 1, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2025 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2025 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor