Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2025 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021