Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2025 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2025
1+By: Hunter (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2025
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
3+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Jurisprudence; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
6+ May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2025 By: Huffman
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to certain statutes and governmental actions that relate
614 to the federal census.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Section 2058.001(b), Government Code, is amended
917 to read as follows:
1018 (b) A governmental entity shall recognize and act on a
1119 published report or count relating to a federal decennial census
1220 and released by the director of the Bureau of the Census of the
1321 United States Department of Commerce on the later of:
1422 (1) [on] September 1 of the year after the calendar
1523 year during which the census was taken [if the report or count is
1624 published on or before that date]; or
1725 (2) [on] the first day of the first calendar month
1826 occurring after the 150th day after the date of the [its]
1927 publication of the report or count [if the report or count is
2028 published after September 1 of the year after the calendar year
2129 during which the census was taken].
2230 SECTION 2. Section 2058.002, Government Code, is amended by
2331 adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
2432 (c) Nothing in this chapter prohibits the legislature from
2533 acting on published reports and counts described by Section
2634 2058.001(b) and relating to the 2020 federal decennial census,
2735 regardless of the date the reports or counts are published.
2836 (d) Notwithstanding any other law, the commissioners court
2937 of a county may act on published reports or counts described by
3038 Section 2058.001(b) and relating to the 2020 federal decennial
3139 census, and any information provided by the state relating to
3240 redistricting based on those reports or counts, in carrying out the
3341 commissioners court's duties under Chapter 42, Election Code, with
3442 respect to establishing or changing election precincts, regardless
3543 of the date the reports or counts are published or the information
3644 is provided or any required period for those duties as provided by
3745 law.
3846 (e) This subsection and Subsections (c) and (d) expire
3947 September 1, 2023.
4048 SECTION 3. Chapter 2058, Government Code, is amended by
4149 adding Section 2058.0021 to read as follows:
4250 Sec. 2058.0021. APPLICABILITY OF 2010 FEDERAL CENSUS;
4351 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) Except as expressly provided by other law
4452 and notwithstanding the definition of "population" in Sections
4553 311.005 and 312.011, a statute that applies to a political
4654 subdivision having a certain population according to the most
4755 recent federal census:
4856 (1) continues to apply to the same political
4957 subdivisions to which the statute applied under the 2010 federal
5058 census, regardless of whether the political subdivisions continue
5159 to have the population prescribed by the statute according to the
5260 2020 federal census; and
5361 (2) does not apply to a political subdivision to which
5462 the statute did not apply under the 2010 federal census, regardless
5563 of whether the political subdivision has the population prescribed
5664 by the statute according to the 2020 federal census.
5765 (b) This section expires September 1, 2023.
5866 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5967 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6068 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6169 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6270 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
63- ______________________________ ______________________________
64- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
65- I certify that H.B. No. 2025 was passed by the House on May 4,
66- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, 1 present, not
67- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
68- No. 2025 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0,
69- 1 present, not voting.
70- ______________________________
71- Chief Clerk of the House
72- I certify that H.B. No. 2025 was passed by the Senate, with
73- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
74- 0.
75- ______________________________
76- Secretary of the Senate
77- APPROVED: __________________
78- Date
79- __________________
80- Governor
71+ * * * * *