Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Record vote RV#1132
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amended 2-Holland
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amended 1-Cortez
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|