Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2027 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 2, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021