Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2030 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Turner of Tarrant, et al. H.B. No. 2030
2- (Senate Sponsor - West, Powell)
3- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
4- May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
5- Education; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
6- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
7- May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
8-Click here to see the committee vote
9- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2030 By: West
1+87R15903 KJE-D
2+ By: Turner of Tarrant, Button, et al. H.B. No. 2030
103
114
125 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
136 AN ACT
147 relating to the establishment by the Texas Higher Education
158 Coordinating Board of a grant program for regional postsecondary
169 education collaboratives.
1710 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1811 SECTION 1. Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding
1912 Subchapter W to read as follows:
2013 SUBCHAPTER W. REGIONAL POSTSECONDARY EDUCATION
2114 COLLABORATIVES GRANT PROGRAM
2215 Sec. 61.931. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
2316 (1) "Low-income student" means a student who is
2417 eligible to receive a grant under the federal Pell Grant program or
2518 has equivalent need, as determined by board rule.
2619 (2) "Regional postsecondary education collaborative"
2720 means a partnership or other collaboration between stakeholders in
2821 education that is focused on improving postsecondary educational
2922 outcomes in a region of the state.
3023 Sec. 61.932. GRANT PROGRAM. (a) The board shall establish
3124 and administer a competitive grant program under which the board
3225 awards grants to eligible regional postsecondary education
3326 collaboratives to improve postsecondary educational outcomes for
3427 low-income students in the state.
3528 (b) In awarding grants under the program, the board shall
3629 give priority to eligible regional postsecondary education
3730 collaboratives that:
3831 (1) focus on supporting low-income students; or
3932 (2) have a demonstrated connection to targeted
4033 workforce fields, as determined by the board.
4134 Sec. 61.933. ELIGIBILITY. To be eligible to receive a grant
4235 under this subchapter, a regional postsecondary education
4336 collaborative must:
4437 (1) include at least one school district and public
4538 junior college;
4639 (2) raise a minimum amount of funding from other
4740 sources for the collaborative's costs, as established by board
4841 rule;
4942 (3) develop and submit to the board a plan detailing
5043 how the collaborative would use grant funds awarded under this
5144 subchapter in a manner permitted under Section 61.935;
5245 (4) build partnerships committed to changing
5346 postsecondary education systems and improving postsecondary
5447 educational outcomes through the use of data, mutual
5548 accountability, and engagement between a student and the student's
5649 community;
5750 (5) measure the collaborative's success by achievement
5851 of increasing postsecondary enrollment and completion at any
5952 institution of higher education or private or independent
6053 institution of higher education and career entry for all students
6154 the collaborative assists;
6255 (6) provide personalized outreach to students and
6356 parents or caregivers;
6457 (7) provide proactive, holistic supports to assist
6558 students in postsecondary persistence and completion and in
6659 connecting with employers; and
6760 (8) satisfy any additional requirements established
6861 by board rule.
6962 Sec. 61.934. GRANT AMOUNT. (a) A grant awarded to an
7063 eligible regional postsecondary education collaborative under the
7164 program must be made for a period sufficient to cover the enrollment
7265 in, persistence in, and timely completion of a certificate or
7366 degree program for two consecutive cohorts of students.
7467 (b) Each grant consists of, for each cohort:
7568 (1) an initial amount at the beginning of the first
7669 academic year for which the grant is awarded equal to $1,000 for
7770 each low-income student who:
7871 (A) graduated in the preceding school year from a
7972 high school participating in the collaborative; and
8073 (B) enrolls at an institution of higher education
8174 or a private or independent institution of higher education for
8275 that academic year; and
8376 (2) at the end of each academic year for which the
8477 grant is awarded, a bonus for each student described by Subdivision
8578 (1) who:
8679 (A) persists, as determined by board rule, at an
8780 institution of higher education or a private or independent
8881 institution of higher education; or
8982 (B) timely completes a certificate or degree
9083 program, as determined by board rule, at an institution of higher
9184 education or a private or independent institution of higher
9285 education.
9386 (c) Subject to Subsection (e), the bonus per student under
9487 Subsection (b)(2)(A) is an amount equal to $25 million divided by
9588 the total number of students who qualify for the bonus.
9689 (d) Subject to Subsection (e), the bonus per student under
9790 Subsection (b)(2)(B) is an amount equal to $20 million divided by
9891 the total number of students who qualify for the bonus.
9992 (e) The amount of a bonus under Subsection (b)(2)(A) or (B)
10093 may not exceed $2,000 per student.
101- Sec. 61.935. GRANT USE. (a) Subject to Subsection (b), a
102- grant awarded to an eligible regional postsecondary education
103- collaborative under this subchapter may be used only for:
94+ Sec. 61.935. GRANT USE. A grant awarded to an eligible
95+ regional postsecondary education collaborative under this
96+ subchapter may be used only for:
10497 (1) staff support for the collaborative;
10598 (2) student services designed to increase
10699 postsecondary enrollment, persistence, and completion;
107100 (3) student financial assistance;
108101 (4) programs that provide training for jobs in
109102 targeted workforce fields, as determined by the board; and
110103 (5) other expenses approved by the board.
111- (b) A grant awarded under this subchapter may not be used to
112- pay for a student's tuition at an institution of higher education or
113- a private or independent institution of higher education.
114104 Sec. 61.936. REPORTING. (a) Each regional postsecondary
115105 education collaborative that receives a grant under this subchapter
116106 shall collect and report to the board information regarding
117107 postsecondary enrollment, persistence, and completion,
118108 disaggregated by category and semester or term, as required by the
119109 board to assist the board in fulfilling its duties under this
120110 subchapter.
121111 (b) Not later than December 1 of each year, the board shall
122112 submit to the legislature a report on the effectiveness of the grant
123113 program established under this subchapter and any recommendations
124114 for legislative or other action.
125115 Sec. 61.937. RULES. The board may adopt rules as necessary
126116 to implement this subchapter.
127117 Sec. 61.938. FEDERAL FUNDING CONTINGENCY. The board is
128118 required to implement the grant program established under this
129119 subchapter only if federal funding is provided to the board for that
130120 purpose as part of any federal coronavirus disease (COVID-19)
131121 relief spending appropriated on or after January 1, 2021. If such
132122 funding is not provided for that purpose, the board may, but is not
133123 required to, implement the grant program using other money
134124 available to the board for that purpose.
135- Sec. 61.939. EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires October
136- 1, 2024.
137125 SECTION 2. (a) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating
138126 Board shall adopt rules to administer Subchapter W, Chapter 61,
139127 Education Code, as added by this Act, as soon as practicable after
140128 the effective date of this Act.
141129 (b) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
142130 begin awarding grants under Subchapter W, Chapter 61, Education
143131 Code, as added by this Act, for the first academic year for which
144132 federal funding is appropriated for that purpose.
145133 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
146134 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
147135 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
148136 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
149137 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
150- * * * * *