Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2030 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Turner of Tarrant, et al. H.B. No. 2030
 (Senate Sponsor - West, Powell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2030 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment by the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board of a grant program for regional postsecondary
 education collaboratives.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter W to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER W. REGIONAL POSTSECONDARY EDUCATION
 COLLABORATIVES GRANT PROGRAM
 Sec. 61.931.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Low-income student" means a student who is
 eligible to receive a grant under the federal Pell Grant program or
 has equivalent need, as determined by board rule.
 (2)  "Regional postsecondary education collaborative"
 means a partnership or other collaboration between stakeholders in
 education that is focused on improving postsecondary educational
 outcomes in a region of the state.
 Sec. 61.932.  GRANT PROGRAM. (a)  The board shall establish
 and administer a competitive grant program under which the board
 awards grants to eligible regional postsecondary education
 collaboratives to improve postsecondary educational outcomes for
 low-income students in the state.
 (b)  In awarding grants under the program, the board shall
 give priority to eligible regional postsecondary education
 collaboratives that:
 (1)  focus on supporting low-income students; or
 (2)  have a demonstrated connection to targeted
 workforce fields, as determined by the board.
 Sec. 61.933.  ELIGIBILITY. To be eligible to receive a grant
 under this subchapter, a regional postsecondary education
 collaborative must:
 (1)  include at least one school district and public
 junior college;
 (2)  raise a minimum amount of funding from other
 sources for the collaborative's costs, as established by board
 rule;
 (3)  develop and submit to the board a plan detailing
 how the collaborative would use grant funds awarded under this
 subchapter in a manner permitted under Section 61.935;
 (4)  build partnerships committed to changing
 postsecondary education systems and improving postsecondary
 educational outcomes through the use of data, mutual
 accountability, and engagement between a student and the student's
 community;
 (5)  measure the collaborative's success by achievement
 of increasing postsecondary enrollment and completion at any
 institution of higher education or private or independent
 institution of higher education and career entry for all students
 the collaborative assists;
 (6)  provide personalized outreach to students and
 parents or caregivers;
 (7)  provide proactive, holistic supports to assist
 students in postsecondary persistence and completion and in
 connecting with employers; and
 (8)  satisfy any additional requirements established
 by board rule.
 Sec. 61.934.  GRANT AMOUNT. (a)  A grant awarded to an
 eligible regional postsecondary education collaborative under the
 program must be made for a period sufficient to cover the enrollment
 in, persistence in, and timely completion of a certificate or
 degree program for two consecutive cohorts of students.
 (b)  Each grant consists of, for each cohort:
 (1)  an initial amount at the beginning of the first
 academic year for which the grant is awarded equal to $1,000 for
 each low-income student who:
 (A)  graduated in the preceding school year from a
 high school participating in the collaborative; and
 (B)  enrolls at an institution of higher education
 or a private or independent institution of higher education for
 that academic year; and
 (2)  at the end of each academic year for which the
 grant is awarded, a bonus for each student described by Subdivision
 (1) who:
 (A)  persists, as determined by board rule, at an
 institution of higher education or a private or independent
 institution of higher education; or
 (B)  timely completes a certificate or degree
 program, as determined by board rule, at an institution of higher
 education or a private or independent institution of higher
 education.
 (c)  Subject to Subsection (e), the bonus per student under
 Subsection (b)(2)(A) is an amount equal to $25 million divided by
 the total number of students who qualify for the bonus.
 (d)  Subject to Subsection (e), the bonus per student under
 Subsection (b)(2)(B) is an amount equal to $20 million divided by
 the total number of students who qualify for the bonus.
 (e)  The amount of a bonus under Subsection (b)(2)(A) or (B)
 may not exceed $2,000 per student.
 Sec. 61.935.  GRANT USE. (a)  Subject to Subsection (b), a
 grant awarded to an eligible regional postsecondary education
 collaborative under this subchapter may be used only for:
 (1)  staff support for the collaborative;
 (2)  student services designed to increase
 postsecondary enrollment, persistence, and completion;
 (3)  student financial assistance;
 (4)  programs that provide training for jobs in
 targeted workforce fields, as determined by the board; and
 (5)  other expenses approved by the board.
 (b)  A grant awarded under this subchapter may not be used to
 pay for a student's tuition at an institution of higher education or
 a private or independent institution of higher education.
 Sec. 61.936.  REPORTING. (a)  Each regional postsecondary
 education collaborative that receives a grant under this subchapter
 shall collect and report to the board information regarding
 postsecondary enrollment, persistence, and completion,
 disaggregated by category and semester or term, as required by the
 board to assist the board in fulfilling its duties under this
 subchapter.
 (b)  Not later than December 1 of each year, the board shall
 submit to the legislature a report on the effectiveness of the grant
 program established under this subchapter and any recommendations
 for legislative or other action.
 Sec. 61.937.  RULES. The board may adopt rules as necessary
 to implement this subchapter.
 Sec. 61.938.  FEDERAL FUNDING CONTINGENCY. The board is
 required to implement the grant program established under this
 subchapter only if federal funding is provided to the board for that
 purpose as part of any federal coronavirus disease (COVID-19)
 relief spending appropriated on or after January 1, 2021. If such
 funding is not provided for that purpose, the board may, but is not
 required to, implement the grant program using other money
 available to the board for that purpose.
 Sec. 61.939.  EXPIRATION.  This subchapter expires October
 1, 2024.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board shall adopt rules to administer Subchapter W, Chapter 61,
 Education Code, as added by this Act, as soon as practicable after
 the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 begin awarding grants under Subchapter W, Chapter 61, Education
 Code, as added by this Act, for the first academic year for which
 federal funding is appropriated for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *