Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2036 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Johnson of Dallas, Patterson, Vo H.B. No. 2036
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of close relative of a deceased victim
 for purposes of certain laws relating to the release of an inmate on
 parole or to mandatory supervision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 508.117(g)(1), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Close relative of a deceased victim" means a
 person who, regardless of whether the victim's death was related to
 the offense committed, was:
 (A)  the spouse of the victim at the time of the
 victim's death;
 (B)  a parent of the deceased victim;
 (C)  an adult brother, sister, or child of the
 deceased victim; or
 (D)  the nearest relative of the deceased victim
 by consanguinity, if the persons described by Paragraphs (A)
 through (C) are deceased or are incapacitated due to physical or
 mental illness or infirmity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *