Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#242
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Record vote RV#217
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Amended 1-Talarico
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Point of order overruled Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|