Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2045 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021