Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 30, 2021