1 | | - | H.B. No. 2064 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Leach (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2064 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 11, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 1; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2064 By: Hughes |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the amount of a hospital or physician lien on certain |
---|
6 | 14 | | causes of action or claims. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 55.004(b), Property Code, is amended to |
---|
9 | 17 | | read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (b) A hospital lien described by Section 55.002(a) is for |
---|
11 | 19 | | the lesser of: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) the amount of the hospital's charges for services |
---|
13 | 21 | | provided to the injured individual during the first 100 days of the |
---|
14 | 22 | | injured individual's hospitalization; [or] |
---|
15 | 23 | | (2) 50 percent of all amounts recovered by the injured |
---|
16 | 24 | | individual through a cause of action, judgment, or settlement |
---|
17 | 25 | | described by Section 55.003(a); or |
---|
18 | 26 | | (3) if the trier of fact specifies the amount awarded |
---|
19 | 27 | | for hospital charges for services provided to the injured |
---|
20 | 28 | | individual, the amount awarded by the trier of fact for the services |
---|
21 | 29 | | provided to the injured individual by the hospital less the pro rata |
---|
22 | 30 | | share of reasonable attorney's fees and expenses the injured |
---|
24 | 32 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
25 | 33 | | to a lien for services provided to an injured individual on or after |
---|
26 | 34 | | the effective date of this Act. A lien for services provided before |
---|
27 | 35 | | the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect |
---|
28 | 36 | | immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is |
---|
29 | 37 | | continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
30 | 38 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
31 | 39 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
32 | 40 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
33 | 41 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
34 | 42 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
35 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
36 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
37 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2064 was passed by the House on May 6, |
---|
38 | | - | 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
39 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
40 | | - | No. 2064 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, |
---|
41 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
44 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2064 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
45 | | - | amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays |
---|
46 | | - | 4. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
49 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Date |
---|
51 | | - | __________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 43 | + | * * * * * |
---|