Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2073 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 7, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021