Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2073 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2073
1+By: Burrows, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 2073
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2021;
3+ April 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
4+ Government; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0;
6+ May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2073 By: Springer
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to quarantine leave for fire fighters, peace officers,
614 detention officers, and emergency medical technicians employed by,
715 appointed by, or elected for a political subdivision.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 180, Local Government
1018 Code, is amended to read as follows:
1119 CHAPTER 180. MISCELLANEOUS PROVISIONS AFFECTING OFFICERS AND
1220 EMPLOYEES OF MORE THAN ONE TYPE OF [MUNICIPALITIES, COUNTIES, AND
1321 CERTAIN OTHER] LOCAL GOVERNMENT [GOVERNMENTS]
1422 SECTION 2. Chapter 180, Local Government Code, is amended
1523 by adding Section 180.008 to read as follows:
1624 Sec. 180.008. PAID QUARANTINE LEAVE FOR FIRE FIGHTERS,
1725 PEACE OFFICERS, DETENTION OFFICERS, AND EMERGENCY MEDICAL
1826 TECHNICIANS. (a) In this section:
1927 (1) "Detention officer" means an individual appointed
2028 or employed by a political subdivision as a county jailer or other
2129 individual responsible for the care and custody of individuals
2230 incarcerated in a county or municipal jail.
2331 (2) "Emergency medical technician" means an
2432 individual who is:
2533 (A) certified as an emergency medical technician
2634 under Chapter 773, Health and Safety Code; and
2735 (B) employed by a political subdivision.
2836 (3) "Fire fighter" means a paid employee of a
2937 municipal fire department or emergency services district who:
3038 (A) holds a position that requires substantial
3139 knowledge of fire fighting;
3240 (B) has met the requirements for certification by
3341 the Texas Commission on Fire Protection under Chapter 419,
3442 Government Code; and
3543 (C) performs a function listed in Section
3644 143.003(4)(A).
3745 (4) "Health authority" has the meaning assigned by
3846 Section 121.021, Health and Safety Code.
3947 (5) "Peace officer" means an individual described by
4048 Article 2.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, who is elected for,
4149 employed by, or appointed by a political subdivision.
4250 (b) The governing body of a political subdivision shall
4351 develop and implement a paid quarantine leave policy for fire
4452 fighters, peace officers, detention officers, and emergency
4553 medical technicians who are employed by, appointed by, or elected
4654 for the political subdivision and ordered to quarantine or isolate
4755 due to a possible or known exposure to a communicable disease while
4856 on duty.
4957 (c) A paid quarantine leave policy must:
5058 (1) provide that a fire fighter, peace officer,
5159 detention officer, or emergency medical technician on paid
5260 quarantine leave receive:
5361 (A) all employment benefits and compensation,
5462 including leave accrual, pension benefits, and health benefit plan
5563 benefits for the duration of the leave; and
5664 (B) reimbursement for reasonable costs related
5765 to the quarantine, including lodging, medical, and transportation;
5866 and
5967 (2) require that the leave be ordered by the person's
6068 supervisor or the political subdivision's health authority.
6169 (d) A political subdivision may not reduce a fire fighter's,
6270 peace officer's, detention officer's, or emergency medical
6371 technician's sick leave balance, vacation leave balance, holiday
6472 leave balance, or other paid leave balance in connection with paid
6573 quarantine leave taken in accordance with a policy adopted under
6674 this section.
6775 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6876 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6977 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7078 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7179 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
72- ______________________________ ______________________________
73- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
74- I certify that H.B. No. 2073 was passed by the House on April
75- 7, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
76- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
77- No. 2073 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0,
78- 1 present, not voting.
79- ______________________________
80- Chief Clerk of the House
81- I certify that H.B. No. 2073 was passed by the Senate, with
82- amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
83- 0.
84- ______________________________
85- Secretary of the Senate
86- APPROVED: __________________
87- Date
88- __________________
89- Governor
80+ * * * * *