Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2086 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021