Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2086 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2086
1+By: Morales of Maverick (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2086
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
3+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Transportation; May 17, 2021, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to appeals from an interlocutory order denying a motion
612 for summary judgment by certain contractors.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 51.014(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
915 Code, is amended to read as follows:
1016 (a) A person may appeal from an interlocutory order of a
1117 district court, county court at law, statutory probate court, or
1218 county court that:
1319 (1) appoints a receiver or trustee;
1420 (2) overrules a motion to vacate an order that
1521 appoints a receiver or trustee;
1622 (3) certifies or refuses to certify a class in a suit
1723 brought under Rule 42 of the Texas Rules of Civil Procedure;
1824 (4) grants or refuses a temporary injunction or grants
1925 or overrules a motion to dissolve a temporary injunction as
2026 provided by Chapter 65;
2127 (5) denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
2228 on an assertion of immunity by an individual who is an officer or
2329 employee of the state or a political subdivision of the state;
2430 (6) denies a motion for summary judgment that is based
2531 in whole or in part upon a claim against or defense by a member of
2632 the electronic or print media, acting in such capacity, or a person
2733 whose communication appears in or is published by the electronic or
2834 print media, arising under the free speech or free press clause of
2935 the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, or Article
3036 I, Section 8, of the Texas Constitution, or Chapter 73;
3137 (7) grants or denies the special appearance of a
3238 defendant under Rule 120a, Texas Rules of Civil Procedure, except
3339 in a suit brought under the Family Code;
3440 (8) grants or denies a plea to the jurisdiction by a
3541 governmental unit as that term is defined in Section 101.001;
3642 (9) denies all or part of the relief sought by a motion
3743 under Section 74.351(b), except that an appeal may not be taken from
3844 an order granting an extension under Section 74.351;
3945 (10) grants relief sought by a motion under Section
4046 74.351(l);
4147 (11) denies a motion to dismiss filed under Section
4248 90.007;
4349 (12) denies a motion to dismiss filed under Section
4450 27.003;
4551 (13) denies a motion for summary judgment filed by an
4652 electric utility regarding liability in a suit subject to Section
4753 75.0022; [or]
4854 (14) denies a motion filed by a municipality with a
4955 population of 500,000 or more in an action filed under Section
5056 54.012(6) or 214.0012, Local Government Code; or
51- (15) grants or denies a motion for summary judgment
52- filed by a contractor based on Section 97.002.
57+ (15) denies a motion for summary judgment filed by a
58+ contractor based on Section 97.002.
5359 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5460 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5561 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5662 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5763 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
58- ______________________________ ______________________________
59- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
60- I certify that H.B. No. 2086 was passed by the House on April
61- 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
62- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
63- No. 2086 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0,
64- 1 present, not voting.
65- ______________________________
66- Chief Clerk of the House
67- I certify that H.B. No. 2086 was passed by the Senate, with
68- amendments, on May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
69- 0.
70- ______________________________
71- Secretary of the Senate
72- APPROVED: __________________
73- Date
74- __________________
75- Governor
64+ * * * * *