House | 04/21/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to Elections | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Filed |