Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Record vote RV#886
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Record vote RV#840
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 2-Sanford
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Amended 1-Thierry
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Original bill distributed 6:49PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Original bill ordered printed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Point of order sustained Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2020
|
Filed
|
|
|