Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB211 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021