Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2116 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021