Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2116 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2116
1+By: Krause, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 2116
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021;
3+ May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to certain agreements by architects and engineers in or in
612 connection with certain construction contracts.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. The heading to Chapter 130, Civil Practice and
915 Remedies Code, is amended to read as follows:
1016 CHAPTER 130. LIABILITY PROVISIONS [INDEMNIFICATION] IN CERTAIN
1117 CONSTRUCTION CONTRACTS
1218 SECTION 2. Section 130.002, Civil Practice and Remedies
13- Code, is amended by adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), and (f) to
14- read as follows:
15- (c) Except as provided by Subsection (d), (e), or (f), a
16- covenant or promise in, in connection with, or collateral to a
17- construction contract for engineering or architectural services
18- related to an improvement to real property is void and
19- unenforceable to the extent the covenant or promise provides that a
20- licensed engineer or registered architect must defend a party,
21- including a third party, against a claim based wholly or partly on
22- the negligence of, fault of, or breach of contract by the owner, the
23- owner's agent, the owner's employee, or another entity over which
24- the owner exercises control. A covenant or promise in, in
25- connection with, or collateral to a contract for engineering or
26- architectural services related to an improvement to real property
27- may provide for the reimbursement of an owner's reasonable
28- attorney's fees in proportion to the engineer's or architect's
29- liability.
19+ Code, is amended by adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to read as
20+ follows:
21+ (c) Except as provided by Subsection (d) or (e), a covenant
22+ or promise in, in connection with, or collateral to a construction
23+ contract for engineering or architectural services related to an
24+ improvement to real property is void and unenforceable if the
25+ covenant or promise provides that a licensed engineer or registered
26+ architect must defend a party, including a third party, against a
27+ claim based wholly or partly on the negligence of, fault of, or
28+ breach of contract by the owner, the owner's agent, the owner's
29+ employee, or another entity over which the owner exercises control.
30+ A covenant or promise in, in connection with, or collateral to a
31+ contract for engineering or architectural services related to an
32+ improvement to real property may provide for the reimbursement of
33+ an owner's reasonable attorney's fees in proportion to the
34+ engineer's or architect's liability.
3035 (d) Notwithstanding Subsection (c), an owner that is a party
3136 to a contract for engineering or architectural services related to
3237 an improvement to real property may require in the contract that the
3338 engineer or architect name the owner as an additional insured under
34- any of the engineer's or architect's insurance coverage to the
35- extent additional insureds are allowed under the policy and provide
36- any defense to the owner provided by the policy to a named insured.
37- (e) Subsection (c) does not apply to a contract for services
38- in which an owner contracts with an entity to provide both design
39- and construction services.
40- (f) Subsection (c) does not apply to a covenant to defend a
41- party, including a third party, for a claim of negligent hiring of
42- the architect or engineer.
39+ the engineer's or architect's commercial general liability
40+ insurance policy and provide any defense to the owner provided by
41+ the policy to a named insured.
42+ (e) Subsection (c) does not apply to a contract for
43+ design-build services in which an owner contracts with a single
44+ entity to provide both design and construction services.
4345 SECTION 3. Chapter 130, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
4446 is amended by adding Section 130.0021 to read as follows:
4547 Sec. 130.0021. ARCHITECT'S OR ENGINEER'S STANDARD OF CARE.
4648 (a) A construction contract for architectural or engineering
4749 services or a contract related to the construction or repair of an
4850 improvement to real property that contains architectural or
4951 engineering services as a component part must require that the
5052 architectural or engineering services be performed with the
5153 professional skill and care ordinarily provided by competent
5254 architects or engineers practicing under the same or similar
5355 circumstances and professional license.
5456 (b) If a contract described by Subsection (a) contains a
5557 provision establishing a different standard of care than the
5658 standard described by Subsection (a):
5759 (1) the provision is void and unenforceable; and
5860 (2) the standard of care described by Subsection (a)
5961 applies to the performance of the architectural or engineering
6062 services.
6163 (c) Section 130.004 does not limit the applicability of this
6264 section.
6365 SECTION 4. Section 130.004, Civil Practice and Remedies
6466 Code, is amended to read as follows:
6567 Sec. 130.004. OWNER OF INTEREST IN REAL PROPERTY. (a)
6668 Except as provided by Section 130.002(b) or (c) or Section
6769 130.0021, this chapter does not apply to an owner of an interest in
6870 real property or persons employed solely by that owner.
6971 (b) Except as provided by Section 130.002(b) or (c) or
7072 Section 130.0021, this chapter does not prohibit or make void or
7173 unenforceable a covenant or promise to:
7274 (1) indemnify or hold harmless an owner of an interest
7375 in real property and persons employed solely by that owner; or
7476 (2) allocate, release, liquidate, limit, or exclude
7577 liability in connection with a construction contract between an
7678 owner or other person for whom a construction contract is being
7779 performed and a registered architect or licensed engineer.
7880 SECTION 5. (a) Section 130.002(c), Civil Practice and
7981 Remedies Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a covenant or
8082 promise in, in connection with, or collateral to a contract entered
8183 into on or after the effective date of this Act.
8284 (b) Sections 130.002(d) and 130.0021, Civil Practice and
8385 Remedies Code, as added by this Act, apply only to a contract
8486 entered into on or after the effective date of this Act.
8587 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
86- ______________________________ ______________________________
87- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
88- I certify that H.B. No. 2116 was passed by the House on April
89- 21, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 21, 1 present, not
90- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
91- No. 2116 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 6,
92- 2 present, not voting.
93- ______________________________
94- Chief Clerk of the House
95- I certify that H.B. No. 2116 was passed by the Senate, with
96- amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays
97- 2.
98- ______________________________
99- Secretary of the Senate
100- APPROVED: __________________
101- Date
102- __________________
103- Governor
88+ * * * * *