Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2152 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2021

                    By: Meyer, Holland H.B. No. 2152
 (Senate Sponsor - Nichols)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
 May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2152 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the online renewal of vehicle registration.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.0435 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.0435.  ONLINE REGISTRATION RENEWAL. If a person is
 otherwise eligible to renew a vehicle registration under this
 chapter, the person may renew the vehicle registration through an
 online registration system maintained by the department.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *