Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note May 4, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021