Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2152 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2152
1+By: Meyer, Holland H.B. No. 2152
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Nichols)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2021;
4+ May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Transportation; May 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0;
7+ May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2152 By: Nichols
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the online renewal of vehicle registration.
615 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
716 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
817 is amended by adding Section 502.0435 to read as follows:
918 Sec. 502.0435. ONLINE REGISTRATION RENEWAL. If a person is
1019 otherwise eligible to renew a vehicle registration under this
1120 chapter, the person may renew the vehicle registration through an
1221 online registration system maintained by the department.
1322 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
14- ______________________________ ______________________________
15- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
16- I certify that H.B. No. 2152 was passed by the House on April
17- 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 1, 2 present, not
18- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
19- No. 2152 on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0,
20- 1 present, not voting.
21- ______________________________
22- Chief Clerk of the House
23- I certify that H.B. No. 2152 was passed by the Senate, with
24- amendments, on May 12, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
25- 0.
26- ______________________________
27- Secretary of the Senate
28- APPROVED: __________________
29- Date
30- __________________
31- Governor
23+ * * * * *