Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2172 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 28, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021