Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2172 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Morales of Maverick (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2172
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 22, 2021, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2172 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the hotel occupancy tax imposed by certain counties and
 the use of revenue from that tax; reducing the maximum rate of that
 tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 352.002(d), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (d)  The tax imposed by a county authorized by Subsection
 (a)(6) [(a)(4), (6)], (8), (9), (10), (11), (14), (15), (17), (19),
 (20), (21), (23), or (29) to impose the tax does not apply to a hotel
 located in a municipality that imposes a tax under Chapter 351
 applicable to the hotel. This subsection does not apply to:
 (1)  a county authorized by Subsection (a)(6) to impose
 the tax that:
 (A)  has a population of less than 40,000 and
 adjoins the most populous county in this state; or
 (B)  has a population of more than 200,000 and
 borders the Neches River; or
 (2)  a county authorized by Subsection (a)(9) to impose
 the tax that has a population of more than 9,000.
 SECTION 2.  Section 352.003, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (y) to read as follows:
 (y)  The tax rate in a county authorized to impose the tax
 under Section 352.002(a)(4) may not exceed two percent of the price
 paid for a room in a hotel.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 352, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 352.114 to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.114.  USE OF REVENUE:  CERTAIN COUNTIES CONTAINING
 AN INDIAN RESERVATION. (a)  In addition to the purposes authorized
 by this chapter, the revenue from a tax imposed under this chapter
 by a county authorized to impose the tax under Section
 352.002(a)(4) may be used to make repairs and improvements to the
 county airport or to provide reimbursement for repairs and
 improvements to the airport.
 (b)  A county to which this section applies may not use
 revenue from a tax imposed under this chapter for a purpose
 described by Subsection (a) in a total amount that would exceed the
 amount of hotel revenue in the county that is likely to be
 reasonably attributable to guests traveling through the airport
 during the 15-year period beginning on the date the county first
 uses the tax revenue for that purpose.
 (c)  A county to which this section applies may not use
 revenue from a tax imposed under this chapter for a purpose
 described by Subsection (a) after the 10th anniversary of the date
 the county first uses the revenue for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *