Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2201 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 16, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021