Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2205 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 15, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021