4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to applicability of the International Swimming Pool and |
---|
6 | 15 | | Spa Code to certain pools, spas, and other swimming areas. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Section 341.0645, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
9 | 18 | | amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d), |
---|
10 | 19 | | (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 20 | | (b) The executive commissioner shall adopt by rule pool |
---|
12 | 21 | | safety standards necessary to prevent drowning. The standards must: |
---|
13 | 22 | | (1) be at least as stringent as those imposed under the |
---|
14 | 23 | | federal Virginia Graeme Baker Pool and Spa Safety Act (15 U.S.C. |
---|
15 | 24 | | Section 8001 et seq.); and |
---|
16 | 25 | | (2) comply with and adopt by reference a version of the |
---|
17 | 26 | | International Swimming Pool and Spa Code, as defined by Section |
---|
18 | 27 | | 214.103, Local Government Code, that is not older than the version |
---|
19 | 28 | | in effect on May 1, 2019, regarding all construction, alteration, |
---|
20 | 29 | | renovation, enlargement, and repair of commercial swimming pools |
---|
21 | 30 | | and spas. |
---|
22 | 31 | | (c) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the department is not |
---|
23 | 32 | | required to adopt Chapter 1 of the International Swimming Pool and |
---|
24 | 33 | | Spa Code. |
---|
25 | 34 | | (d) Subsection (b) does not affect requirements for pool |
---|
26 | 35 | | yard enclosure imposed under Chapter 757. |
---|
27 | 36 | | (e) The executive commissioner by rule shall authorize a |
---|
28 | 37 | | minor addition, alteration, renovation, or repair to an existing |
---|
29 | 38 | | pool or spa and related mechanical, electrical, and plumbing |
---|
30 | 39 | | systems in the same manner and arrangement as the executive |
---|
31 | 40 | | commissioner authorized the construction of the pool or spa and |
---|
32 | 41 | | related mechanical, electrical, and plumbing systems. |
---|
33 | 42 | | (f) A person may use, maintain, and repair a pool or spa that |
---|
34 | 43 | | was in compliance with the laws of this state on August 31, 2021, |
---|
35 | 44 | | and related mechanical, electrical, and plumbing systems in |
---|
36 | 45 | | accordance with the laws applicable to the pool or system on that |
---|
37 | 46 | | date. |
---|
38 | 47 | | (g) Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(2), this section does |
---|
39 | 48 | | not affect the authority of the executive commissioner to adopt |
---|
40 | 49 | | rules regarding pool operation and management, water quality, |
---|
41 | 50 | | safety standards unrelated to design and construction, signage, and |
---|
42 | 51 | | enclosures. |
---|
43 | 52 | | SECTION 2. Section 214.103, Local Government Code, is |
---|
44 | 53 | | amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to |
---|
45 | 54 | | read as follows: |
---|
46 | 55 | | (b) To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the |
---|
47 | 56 | | International Swimming Pool and Spa Code, as it existed on May 1, |
---|
48 | 57 | | 2019, is adopted as the municipal swimming pool and spa code in this |
---|
49 | 58 | | state. A municipality may adopt a more recent version of the |
---|
50 | 59 | | International Swimming Pool and Spa Code to apply in the |
---|
51 | 60 | | municipality. |
---|
52 | 61 | | (b-1) To the extent a provision of a code adopted by a |
---|
53 | 62 | | municipality under Subsection (b) conflicts with a law of this |
---|
54 | 63 | | state or a regulation on pool operation and management, water |
---|
55 | 64 | | quality, safety standards unrelated to design and construction, |
---|
56 | 65 | | signage, or enclosures, the law or regulation controls. |
---|
57 | 66 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
60 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2205 was passed by the House on April |
---|
61 | | - | 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
62 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
63 | | - | No. 2205 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 132, Nays 14, |
---|
64 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
65 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
67 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2205 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
68 | | - | amendments, on May 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
69 | | - | 0. |
---|
70 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
71 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
72 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
73 | | - | Date |
---|
74 | | - | __________________ |
---|
75 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 67 | + | * * * * * |
---|