Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2220 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021