Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2238 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021