Senate | 05/21/2021 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/21/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 05/13/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/12/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Record vote RV#961 | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Amended 1-Patterson | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Referred to County Affairs | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Filed |