Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2242 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021