Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2290 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 9, 2021