Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2301 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 10, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021