Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2333 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021