Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2390 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2021

                    By: Paul (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2390
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 21, 2021;
 May 3, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 11, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a development corporation created by
 the Gulf Coast Authority to finance certain projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 3.01, Chapter 409, Acts of the 61st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1969, is amended by adding Subsection
 (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  A development corporation created by the authority
 under Chapter 501, Local Government Code, may finance:
 (1)  projects described by Subchapter C, Chapter 501,
 Local Government Code, located inside or outside this state; and
 (2)  qualified improvements as defined by Section
 399.002, Local Government Code, located inside or outside this
 state in the same manner and to the same extent as a municipality or
 county may do so under Chapter 399 of that code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *