Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2390 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis April 9, 2021