House | 05/12/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 11/09/2020 | Filed |