Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 7, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note May 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021