Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2404 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/18/2021

                            H.B. No. 2404


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation and maintenance of a database of
 information regarding certain local economic development
 agreements; providing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 403.0246 and 403.0247 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 403.0246.  LOCAL DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENT DATABASE. (a)
 In this section:
 (1)  "Business day" means a day other than a Saturday,
 Sunday, or state or national holiday.
 (2)  "Local development agreement" means:
 (A)  an agreement entered into by a municipality
 under Section 380.001 or 380.002, Local Government Code;
 (B)  an agreement entered into by a county under
 Section 381.004, Local Government Code; or
 (C)  any other agreement to grant or otherwise
 commit public money or other resources for economic development
 purposes by a local government under Chapter 380 or 381, Local
 Government Code.
 (3)  "Local government" includes:
 (A)  a municipality;
 (B)  a county;
 (C)  a county industrial commission under Section
 381.001, Local Government Code; or
 (D)  a board of development under Section 381.002,
 Local Government Code.
 (b)  The comptroller shall create and make accessible on the
 Internet a database, to be known as the Chapter 380 and 381
 Agreement Database, that contains information regarding all local
 development agreements in this state.
 (c)  For each local development agreement described by
 Subsection (b), the database must include:
 (1)  the name of the local government that entered into
 the agreement;
 (2)  a numerical code assigned to the local government
 by the comptroller;
 (3)  the address of the local government's
 administrative offices and public contact information;
 (4)  the name of the appropriate officer or other
 person representing the local government and that person's contact
 information;
 (5)  the name of any entity that entered into the
 agreement with the local government;
 (6)  the date on which the agreement went into effect
 and the date on which the agreement expires;
 (7)  the focus or scope of the agreement;
 (8)  an electronic copy of the agreement; and
 (9)  the name and contact information of the individual
 reporting the information to the comptroller.
 (d)  The comptroller may consult with the appropriate
 officer of, or other person representing, each local government
 that enters into a local development agreement to obtain the
 information necessary to operate and update the database.
 (e)  The comptroller shall enter into the database for access
 by the public the information described by Subsection (c) not later
 than the 15th business day after the date the comptroller receives
 the information from the providing local government.  The
 information, including a copy of the agreement, must remain
 accessible to the public through the database during the period the
 agreement is in effect.
 (f)  The comptroller may not charge a fee to the public to
 access the database.
 (g)  The comptroller may establish procedures and adopt
 rules to implement this section.
 Sec. 403.0247.  NONCOMPLIANCE; CIVIL PENALTY. (a) In this
 section, "local development agreement" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 403.0246.
 (b)  If a local government that enters into a local
 development agreement has not complied with a requirement to
 provide information under Section 403.0246 of this code or Section
 380.004 or 381.005, Local Government Code, the comptroller shall
 send a notice to the local government. The notice must be in
 writing, describe the information that must be submitted to the
 comptroller, and inform the local government that if the
 information is not provided on or before the 30th day after the date
 the notice is provided, the local government will be subject to a
 civil penalty of $1,000.
 (c)  If a local government does not report the required
 information as prescribed by Subsection (b), the local government
 is liable to the state for a civil penalty of $1,000.
 (d)  The attorney general may sue to collect a civil penalty
 imposed under this section.
 (e)  It is a defense to an action brought under this section
 that the local government provided the required information or
 documents to the extent the information or documents are not exempt
 from disclosure or confidential under Chapter 552.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 380, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 380.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 380.004.  PROVISION OF CERTAIN INFORMATION TO
 COMPTROLLER. (a)  Not later than the 14th day after the date of
 entering into, amending, or renewing an agreement authorized by
 this chapter, a municipality shall submit to the comptroller the
 information described by Section 403.0246(c), Government Code, and
 any other information the comptroller considers necessary to
 operate and update the database described by that section.
 (b)  A municipality shall transmit the information required
 by Subsection (a) in a form and manner prescribed by the
 comptroller.
 (c)  If a municipality submits an agreement to the
 comptroller under this section and maintains an Internet website,
 the municipality shall provide on the website a direct link to the
 location of the agreement information published on the
 comptroller's Internet website.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 381, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 381.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 381.005.  PROVISION OF CERTAIN INFORMATION TO
 COMPTROLLER. (a)  Not later than the 14th day after the date of
 entering into, amending, or renewing an agreement authorized by
 this chapter, a county, county industrial commission, or
 development board, as applicable, shall submit to the comptroller
 the information described by Section 403.0246(c), Government Code,
 and any other information the comptroller considers necessary to
 operate and update the database described by that section.
 (b)  A county, commission, or board shall transmit the
 information required by Subsection (a) in a form and manner
 prescribed by the comptroller.
 (c)  If a county or a commission or board created by the
 county submits an agreement to the comptroller under this section
 and the county maintains an Internet website, the county shall
 provide on the website a direct link to the location of the
 agreement information published on the comptroller's Internet
 website.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  For each agreement described by Section
 403.0246, Government Code, as added by this Act, that is in effect
 on the effective date of this Act, the local government that entered
 into the agreement shall, not later than January 1, 2022, submit to
 the comptroller the information described by that section and any
 other information the comptroller considers necessary to operate
 and update the database required by that section.
 (b)  The comptroller shall publish on the comptroller's
 Internet website the information received under this section not
 later than September 1, 2022.
 SECTION 5.  The comptroller shall create and post on the
 comptroller's Internet website the database required by Section
 403.0246, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 September 1, 2022.
 SECTION 6.  The comptroller is required to implement the
 changes in law made by this Act only if the legislature appropriates
 money specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the comptroller
 may, but is not required to, implement this Act using other
 appropriations available for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2404 was passed by the House on April
 7, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2404 on May 18, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 4,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2404 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 14, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor