Senate | 05/17/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Record vote RV#1136 | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/14/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Amended 1-Dean | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Filed |