House | 04/29/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/26/2021 | Filed |